SC H3193 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 4-23-810, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Creation And Boundaries Of The South Lynches Fire District In Florence And Williamsburg Counties, So As To Alter The Boundaries Of The South Lynches Fire District To Include The Area Within The Municipal Limits Of The Town Of Scranton In Florence County.
Title
South Lynches Fire District
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kirby [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-2 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |