SC H3192 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Hutto, Campbell, Nicholson
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Hutto, Campbell, Nicholson
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING CHAPTER 24 TO TITLE 1 SO AS TO ESTABLISH THE SOUTH CAROLINA SUNSET COMMISSION AND A SUNSET REVIEW DIVISION OF THE LEGISLATIVE AUDIT COUNCIL, TO ESTABLISH PROCEDURES PROVIDING FOR THE MANNER IN WHICH THE PROGRAMS OF CERTAIN AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS OF STATE GOVERNMENT MUST BE EVALUATED TO DETERMINE IF THEY SHOULD BE CONTINUED IN EXISTENCE, MODIFIED, OR TERMINATED, AND TO ESTABLISH THE PROCEDURES BY WHICH THESE PROGRAMS MUST BE CONTINUED, MODIFIED, OR TERMINATED.
Title
Establish The South Carolina Sunset Commission And A Sunset Review Division Of The Legislative Audit Council, To Establish Procedures Providing For The Manner In Which The Programs Of Certain Agencies And Departments Of State Government Must Be Evaluated To Determine If They Should Be Continued In Existence, Modified, Or Terminated, And To Establish The Procedures By Which These Programs Must Be Continued, Modified, Or Terminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Hutto, Campbell, Nicholson | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-15 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced and read first time SJ-15 | |
2010-02-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-6 | |
2010-02-25 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-66 | |
2010-02-25 | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 HJ-64 | |
2010-02-25 | Read second time HJ-64 | |
2010-02-25 | Amended HJ-62 | |
2010-02-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield | |
2010-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis | |
2010-02-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley | |
2010-02-18 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McLeod | |
2010-02-17 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-223 | |
2009-05-14 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Millwood | |
2009-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: E.H.Pitts | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-84 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-84 | |
2008-12-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-16 | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3192&session=118 |