SC H3183 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 11 To Title 41 So As To Enact The "act To Establish Pay Equity", To Provide That No Employer May Pay Wages To Employees At Rates Less Than The Rates Paid To Employees Of Other Races, Religions, Colors, Sexes, Including Gender Identity And Sexual Orientation, Ages, National Origins, Or Disability Statuses For Comparable Work, To Provide Exceptions, To Provide Certain Employment Practices Relating To Requests For The Disclosure Of Wages Are Unlawful, To Provide Exceptions, To Provide Civil Actions Asserting Violations May Be Maintained Against Employers In Courts Of Competent Jurisdiction, To Provide For The Recovery Of Unpaid Wages And Damages, To Provide Penalties For Employers Who Violate The Provisions Of This Act, To Establish Pay Equity, To Provide That The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation Shall Have The Authority To Investigate Violations And To Bring Certain Actions, To Provide Employers Shall Post Certain Information In Conspicuous Places, And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Act to Establish Pay Equity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel, Govan, Cogswell, J.Moore, Pendarvis, S.Williams, Rose, Hosey, Clyburn, R.Williams, Parks, Garvin, Howard, Gilliard, Murray, Wetmore, J.L.Johnson
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde, K.O.Johnson, King, Tedder
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0514 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback