SC H3180 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Servicemembers Civil Relief Act"; To Define The Act's Relevant Terms; To Enumerate Certain Rights, Benefits, And Obligations Of Servicemembers And Their Dependents; To Authorize A Servicemember, The Dependent Of A Servicemember, Or The Attorney General To Bring A Civil Action For Intentional Violations Of The Act; To Establish Remedies And Penalties; And To Require The Adjutant General To Post Certain Information Regarding The Act On The South Carolina National Guard Website

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Service Members Civil Relief

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Act No. 23
2019-05-03 Effective date 04/26/19
2019-04-26 Signed By Governor
2019-04-25 Ratified R 36
2019-04-03HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2019-04-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-21SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-03-20SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-03-20SenateRead second time
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-20HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-19HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-19HouseAmended
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson
2019-02-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0317 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3180&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190213.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190313.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190319.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3180_20190321.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15681
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16152
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16250

Bill Comments

feedback