SC H3179 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-53-360, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Prescriptions, So As To Exempt Surgically Implanted Drug Delivery Systems From The Thirty-one-day Supply Limitation. - Ratified Title
Title
Prescriptions
Sponsors
Rep. Murrell Smith [R] | Rep. Donald McCabe [R] | Rep. Micajah Caskey [R] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] |
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Act No. 23 | |
2021-04-28 | Effective date 04/26/21 | |
2021-04-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-22 | Ratified R 34 | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Polled out of committee Medical Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2021-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0652 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs