SC H3170 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 24-13-37 So As To Provide For The Treatment Of Pregnant And Postpartum Inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment of pregnant and postpartum inmates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Jones, White
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-12-08HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2022-12-08HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
241337(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback