SC H3170 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whitmire, Gagnon, V.S.Moss, Henderson, Putnam, Long, Erickson, Hill
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whitmire, Gagnon, V.S.Moss, Henderson, Putnam, Long, Erickson, Hill
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes; And To Repeal Section 59-101-150 Relating To The Requirement That A State-supported Institution Of Higher Learning Must Receive Approval Of The Commission Or The General Assembly As A Condition To Undertaking A New Program.
Title
State Board for Technical and Comprehensive Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whitmire, Gagnon, V.S.Moss, Henderson, Putnam, Long, Erickson, Hill |
2015-01-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrester, Bannister |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 101 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 103 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 103 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 53 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3170&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3170_20141211.htm |