SC H3166 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Chapter 33, Title 44, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Sickle Cell Disease, So As To Enact The "rena Grant Sickle Cell Disease Voluntary Patient Registry Act"; To Require The South Carolina Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Develop And Maintain A Sickle Cell Disease Voluntary Patient Registry In Which Patients Diagnosed With Sickle Cell Disease May Register; To Establish Requirements For A Physician To Submit The Name And Other Identifying Information Of A Patient Diagnosed With Sickle Cell Disease To The Registry; To Prohibit Release Of Information Contained In The Registry, With Exceptions; To Allow Access To Information In The Registry By, Among Others, Treating Physicians And Other Health Care Practitioners To Verify Patient Registration And Health Care Researchers; To Allow A Patient To Revoke A Registration; And For Other Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Rena Grant Sickle Cell Disease Voluntary Patient Registry Act
Sponsors
Rep. John King [D] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] |
Rep. Carl Anderson [D] | Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Jerry Govan [D] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Act No. 206 | |
2022-06-01 | Effective date 05/23/22 | |
2022-05-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Ratified R 197 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith |
2021-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Govan, Anderson |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |