SC H3165 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Committee report: Favorable Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Mopeds Are Motor Vehicles And Not Motorcycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mopeds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2015-03-10SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2015-03-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2015-03-06HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2015-03-05HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2015-03-05HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2015-03-05HouseRead second time
2015-03-04HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-5-15
2015-02-19HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
2015-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2014-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2014-12-11HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
565130(n/a)See Bill Text
565140(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback