SC H3165 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorize The Board Of Fire Control To Establish Penalties For Violations Of Its Rules And Regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Irmo Fire District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 81) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-21 Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson
2011-04-13 Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-04-13 Introduced and read first time
2011-04-13 Read third time and sent to Senate
2011-04-12 Roll call Yeas-13 Nays-0
2011-04-12 Read second time
2011-04-12 Amended
2011-04-07 Debate adjourned until Tuesday, April 12, 2011
2011-04-06 Debate adjourned until Thursday, April 7, 2011
2011-04-05 Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
2011-01-11 Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2011-01-11 Introduced and read first time
2010-12-07 Referred to Lexington Delegation
2010-12-07 Prefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback