SC H3155 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Admissibility Of Hearsay Statements Made To Forensic Interviewers.
Title
Out of court statements
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] | Rep. Tommy Stringer [R] |
Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long | |
2011-02-01 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Butler Garrick | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-07 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0299 (Similar To) 2012-03-07 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3155&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3155_20101207.htm |