SC H3151 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer These Functions, With Respect To Colleges And Universities, To The Commission Of Higher Education.
Title
Study of U.S. Constitution
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 23 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 23 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-06 | House | Amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-5-15 |
2015-04-29 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-04-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-29-15 |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 29 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |