SC H3149 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Make A Conforming Change And Revise Existing Exemptions
Title
Precious metals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Act No. 292 | |
2014-07-08 | Effective date 06/23/14 | |
2014-06-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-20 | Ratified R 326 | |
2014-06-19 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-7 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2014-06-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-1 |
2014-06-17 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2014-06-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Delleney, Tallon, Weeks |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed O'Dell, Allen, Bennett |
2014-06-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-96 |
2014-06-05 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-4 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 |
2013-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2013-05-01 | House | Amended |
2013-04-30 | House | Debate interrupted by adjournment |
2013-04-30 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 54 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 54 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 54 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 54 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 54 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 54 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |