SC H3138 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Conference committee appointed Erickson, Stavrinakis, Bannister
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Conference committee appointed Erickson, Stavrinakis, Bannister
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Revenue May Issue Licenses To Sell Alcoholic Liquor By The Drink At Multiple Locations On Multiple Days At A Festival On One Application, And To Provide A Definition Of "festival".
Title
Special permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Erickson, Stavrinakis, Bannister |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Rankin, Hutto, Rice |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-100 |
2018-05-10 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-8 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-05-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-18 |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-15 |
2017-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |