SC H3137 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Delete The Requirement That The Fund Receive No Less Than Four And One Half Percent Of The General Fund Revenues Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year, To Delete A Provision Regarding Midyear Cuts, To Provide That The Appropriation To The Fund Must Be Adjusted By The Same Percentage That General Fund Revenues Are Projected To Increase Or Decrease, If Applicable, But Not To Exceed Five Percent, To Require That The Adjustment, If Applicable, Be Included In All Stages Of The Budget Process, And To Delete A Provision Requiring Amendments To The State Aid To Subdivisions Act Be Included In Separate Legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Aid to Subdivisions Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-1
2019-05-20HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-20SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-05-20SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-09SenateConference committee appointed Cromer, Scott, Corbin
2019-05-09HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Bannister, Finlay, Cobb-Hunter
2019-05-09SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-01-31HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-01-31HouseRoll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseAmended
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Young, Clemmons, Cogswell, B.Newton, Anderson, Jefferson, Bales, Blackwell, McDaniel, Moore, R.Williams, Henderson-Myers
2019-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose, Wheeler
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Chellis, Kimmons
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bailey, Erickson, Bradley, Yow, Forrest, Kirby
2019-01-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3137&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190130.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190131.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3137_20190520.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15568
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15569
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16724
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16858
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16866

Bill Comments

feedback