SC H3137 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Term "licensed" And Replace It With The Term "permitted" Throughout And Delete References Allowing For Samplings
Title
Sale of the alcoholic liquors
Sponsors
Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D] | Rep. Peter McCoy [R] | Rep. Jimmy Bales [D] | Rep. James Smith [D] |
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 62 | |
2017-05-26 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 95 | |
2017-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-27 |
2017-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Shealy (ch), Hutto, Senn |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-13 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-05 | House | Amended |
2017-04-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield |
2017-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17 |
2017-03-28 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0401 (Similar To) 2017-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 4 | 1515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 4 | 960 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 1035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |