SC H3114 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Pain-capable Unborn Child Protection Act", To Provide Findings Of The General Assembly, To Define Necessary Terms, To Require A Physician To Calculate The Probable Post-fertilization Age Of An Unborn Child Before Performing Or Inducing An Abortion, To Provide That An Abortion May Not Be Performed If The Probable Post-fertilization Age Of The Unborn Child Is Twenty Or More Weeks, To Provide For Exceptions, To Require Certain Reporting To The Department Of Health And Environmental Control By Facilities In Which Abortions Are Performed, To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Prepare Public Reports That Provide Data On Abortions Performed In The State And To Promulgate Regulations, To Create Criminal Penalties, And To Provide The Act Does Not Implicitly Or Otherwise Repeal Another Provision Of Law
Title
S.C. Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Motion To Recede (Y: 24 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To 3-m Com. (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To 3-m Com. (Y: 79 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Recede (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Recede (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15 A Cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Rule 14 Senator Bright Retain Floor (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Cloture Rule 15a (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Motion 15 A - Cloture (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Motion To Recede (Y: 24 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To 3-m Com. (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To 3-m Com. (Y: 79 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Recede (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Recede (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15 A Cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Rule 14 Senator Bright Retain Floor (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Cloture Rule 15a (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Motion 15 A - Cloture (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Act No. 183 | |
2016-05-27 | Effective date 05/25/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 196 | |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2016-05-17 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2016-05-17 | House | Free conference committee appointed Ridgeway, Nanney, Delleney |
2016-05-17 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-28 |
2016-03-16 | House | Free conference powers rejected |
2016-03-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-26 |
2016-03-09 | House | Free conference powers rejected |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-9 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Free conference report adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Cleary, Hutto, Shealy |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Cleary, Hutto, Shealy |
2015-06-04 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Ridgeway, Nanney, Delleney |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2015-06-03 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-05-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-7 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Special order, set for April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Medical Affairs |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-71 Nays-22 |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-27 |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duckworth, Clemmons |
2015-02-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed. 2-11-15 |
2015-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield, Hill |
2015-01-29 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2015-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss, Whitmire |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Rivers |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0028 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0130 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0025 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0024 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0130 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0025 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0024 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance