SC H3108 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-37-250, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Homestead Property Tax Exemption Allowed For Persons Who Are Over The Age Of Sixty-five Years, Disabled, Or Legally Blind, So As To Increase The Exemption Amount From The First Fifty Thousand Dollars To The First Seventy-five Thousand Dollars Of The Fair Market Value Of The Homestead; And To Repeal Section 12-37-245 Relating To An Obsolete Reference To The Homestead Exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis, K.O.Johnson, King
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3452 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1237245(n/a)See Bill Text
1237250(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback