SC H3107 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 5, Title 6 So As To Provide Definitions, Impose Continuing Duties On Retailers Of Internet-enabled Devices Regarding Filters That Block By Default Websites That Are Known To Facilitate Human Trafficking Or Prostitution And Websites That Display Child Pornography, Revenge Pornography, Or Obscene Material Harmful To Minors And To Establish Procedures To Deactivate The Filter And To Ensure Quality Control Over The Filters, To Provide A Remedy For Websites That Are Blocked Mistakenly, To Provide Civil Penalties, To Provide Exceptions, To Establish "the South Carolina Human Trafficking And Child Exploitation Prevention Grant Fund", And To Impose A Nominal Admission Fee On Live Adult Entertainment Establishments To Be Remitted To The Department Of Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking and child exploitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-01-12 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback