SC H3101 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "interstate Medical Licensure Compact" By Adding Article 3 To Chapter 47, Title 40 So As To Provide For The Entry Of South Carolina Into A Multistate Physician Licensure Compact, To Provide For The Reciprocal Practice Of Medicine Among The States That Are Parties To The Compact, To Provide Standards And Procedures Applicable To Practicing Medicine In Other States Pursuant To The Compact, To Provide For A Coordinated Licensure Information System For Sharing Data Among Compact States, And To Provide Procedures For Dispute Resolutions, Disciplinary Actions, And Termination Of Memberships.
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley, McCravy |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0320 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs