SC H3096 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "south Carolina Constitutional Carry Act Of 2021"; To Amend Section 10-11-320, Relating To Carrying Or Discharging Of A Firearm, So As To Delete The Term "concealable Weapons Permit" And Replace It With The Term "firearm"; To Amend Section 16-23-20, Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Handgun, So As To Revise The Locations And Circumstances Where Carrying A Handgun Is Legal; To Amend Section 16-23-50, Relating To Penalties Associated With Violating Certain Handgun Laws, So As To Provide That The Penalties Do Not Apply To A Person Carrying A Concealable Weapon Onto A Premise That Displays A Sign That Prohibits The Carrying Of A Concealable Weapon; To Amend Sections 16-23-420 And 16-23-430, Both Relating To The Possession Of A Firearm On School Property, So As To Delete References To Concealed Weapon Permits, To Delete The Term "weapon" And Replace It With The Term "firearm", And To Provide That Both Sections Do Not Apply To A Person Who Lawfully Is Carrying A Weapon Secured In A Motor Vehicle; To Amend Section 16-23-465, Relating To Penalties For Carrying A Firearm Into A Business That Sells Alcoholic Beverages For On-premise Consumption, So As To Provide This Provision Does Not Apply To A Person Who Violates Certain Offenses, And To Provide Additional Circumstances When It Does Apply To Certain Offenses; To Amend Section 23-31-215, Relating To The Issuance Of A Concealed Weapon Permit, So As To Delete The Provision That Requires A Permit Holder To Possess His Permit Identification When Carrying A Concealable Weapon, To Revise The Provision That Lists The Places Upon Which A Person May Not Carry A Concealable Weapon, To Revise The Provision That Allows Certain Persons To Carry A Concealable Weapon Without A Permit, And Revise The Penalties That May Be Imposed Pursuant To This Section; To Amend Section 23-31-220, Relating To A Property Owner's Right To Allow A Holder Of A Concealed Weapons Permit To Carry A Weapon Onto His Property, So As To Make Technical Changes, To Provide This Provision Regulates Both Persons Who Possess And Do Not Possess A Concealable Weapons Permit, And To Provide This Provision Applies To A Person Who Knowingly Brings A Concealable Weapon Onto A Premise Or Workplace; To Amend Section 23-31-235, Relating To The Posting Of Signs That Prohibit The Carrying Of Concealable Weapons Onto A Premise, So As To Provide The Signage Prohibits Both Permit Holders And Non-permit Holders From Carrying A Weapon Onto The Premise; And To Repeal Sections 16-23-460, 23-31-225, And 23-31-230 Relating To Unlawfully Carrying A Concealed Deadly Weapon, And Carrying A Concealable Weapon From A Motor Vehicle To Certain Rental Dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Constitutional Carry Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House: Table Amendment 6 Amendment Number 6 (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 68 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Continue (Y: 42 N: 74 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-07HouseRoll call Yeas-69 Nays-47
2021-04-07HouseRead second time
2021-04-07HouseAmended
2021-04-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Dabney, Gagnon, D.C.Moss, Bailey
2021-03-18HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-03-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2021-03-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
2021-03-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: White
2021-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott
2021-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Hixon
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Nutt, T.Moore
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011320(n/a)See Bill Text
162320(n/a)See Bill Text
1623420(n/a)See Bill Text
1623430(n/a)See Bill Text
1623460(n/a)See Bill Text
1623465(n/a)See Bill Text
162350(n/a)See Bill Text
2331215(n/a)See Bill Text
2331220(n/a)See Bill Text
2331225(n/a)See Bill Text
2331230(n/a)See Bill Text
2331235(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3096&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3096_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3096_20210317.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3096_20210407.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3096_20210408.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/H3096%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19096
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19097
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19099
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19105
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19100

Bill Comments

feedback