SC H3093 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That When An Owner Receiving The Four Percent Assessment Ratio Dies, The Property Shall Continue To Receive The Special Assessment Rate Until The Deceased's Estate Is Closed, So Long As The Property Is Not Rented.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property assessment ratios

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-2
2017-04-04HouseRead second time
2017-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, S.Rivers
2017-03-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0587 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1243220(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback