SC H3093 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Application Of This Prohibition And Related Requirements To Information Obtained From Local Governments And Other Political Subdivisions.
Title
Obtaining or using personal information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2015-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0254 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Allen, Thurmond
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3093&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3093_20141211.htm |