SC H3093 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Abandoned Buildings Revitalization Act" To Provide That A Taxpayer Making Investments Of A Certain Size In Rehabilitating An Abandoned Building Based On The Population Of The Political Subdivision In Which The Building Is Located May At The Taxpayer's Option Receive Specified Income Tax Credits Or Credits Against The Property Tax Liability, To Provide The Procedures, Criteria, And Requirements Necessary To Obtain These Credits, And To Provide That The Provisions Of Chapter 67, Title 12 Are Repealed On December 31, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned Buildings Revitalization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-18 Act No. 57
2013-06-18 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2013-06-11 Signed By Governor
2013-06-11 Ratified R 91
2013-06-06HouseRoll call Yeas-85 Nays-0
2013-06-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2013-06-05SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2013-06-04SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2013-06-04SenateRead second time
2013-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2013-05-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2013-04-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-25SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2013-04-25SenateIntroduced and read first time
2013-04-25HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2013-04-24HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-2
2013-04-24HouseRead second time
2013-04-24HouseAmended
2013-04-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod, Whipper
2013-04-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2013-04-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2013-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2012-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2012-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0234 (Similar To) 2014-06-03 - Requests for debate-Rep

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3093&session=120&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20121211.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130418.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130423.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130530.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3093_20130604.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6003
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6552
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=6677

Bill Comments 750

feedback