SC H3093 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Committed to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "music Therapy Practice Act" To Regulate The Practice Of Music Therapy, To Provide Certain Definitions, To Create The South Carolina Board Of Music Therapy To Assist The Department On All Matters Pertaining To The Education, Examination, Licensure, And Continuing Education Of Licensed Music Therapists And The Practice Of Music Therapy, To Prohibit The Practice Of Music Therapy Without A License, To Require That The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation Shall Provide Administrative, Fiscal, Investigative, Inspectional, Clerical, Secretarial, And License Renewal Operations And Activities Of The Board, To Provide Duties And Responsibilities Of The Board, To Provide Criteria For Licensure, And To Provide For The Use Of A Professional Designation, Among Other Things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Music Therapy Practice Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Committed to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2012-03-01 Debate adjourned until Tues., 03--6-12
2012-03-01 Requests for debate-Rep
2012-02-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2012-02-28 Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2011-01-11 Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2011-01-11 Introduced and read first time
2010-12-07 Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2010-12-07 Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

S1057 (Similar To) 2012-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback