SC H3087 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 48-43-400 So As To Prohibit The Approval Of An Action To Facilitate Atlantic Ocean Marine Seismic Testing To Locate Reserves Of Oil And Natural Gas Or The Transportation Of Offshore Oil And Natural Gas Into The Land And Waters Of This State By The State Of South Carolina, A State Agency, Or A Political Subdivision Of This State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offshore oil

Sponsors

Rep. Peter McCoy [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]Rep. Weston Newton [R]Rep. Seth Rose [D]
Rep. West Cox [R]Rep. Mandy Norrell [D]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]Rep. Michael Sottile [R]
Rep. Gary Clary [R]Rep. William Hewitt [R]Rep. Russell Ott [D]Rep. Roger Kirby [D]
Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Marvin Pendarvis [D]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R]
Rep. Robert Williams [D]Rep. Nancy Mace [R]Rep. Linda Bennett [R]Rep. William Cogswell [R]
Rep. William Bailey [R]Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. Beth Bernstein [D]Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D]
Rep. Micajah Caskey [R]Rep. William Herbkersman [R]Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]Rep. JA Moore [D]
Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. Patricia Henegan [D]Rep. Shedron Williams [D]
Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D]Rep. Con Chellis [R]Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R]Rep. Bobby Cox [R]
Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. William Wheeler [D]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Rep. Krystle Matthews [D]
Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Sylleste Davis [R]Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]
Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Cezar McKnight [D]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]
Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D]Rep. Wendy Brawley [D]Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. Ashley Trantham [R]
Rep. Annie McDaniel [D]Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D]Rep. John King [D]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]
Rep. Paula Rawl Calhoon [R]Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R]Rep. Christopher Murphy [R]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]
Rep. Randy Ligon [R]Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Max Hyde [R]
Rep. McLain Toole [R]Rep. John West [R]Rep. Christopher Wooten [R]Rep. Christopher Hart [D]
Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. David Mack [D]Rep. Jerry Govan [D]
Rep. Carl Anderson [D]Rep. Steve Moss [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
2020-02-19HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-20-20
2020-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson
2020-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan
2020-01-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mack
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole, West, Wooten, Hart, Hosey, Clyburn
2020-01-15HouseRequests for debate-Rep(s). Hiott, DC Moss, Bryant, Forrest, Martin, Bailey, GR Smith, Chumley, Magnusson, Haddon, Burns, Thayer, Toole, Kirby, Hixon, and Calhoon
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk, Jefferson, Simrill, McKnight, Huggins, Ridgeway, Robinson, Brawley, Weeks, Trantham, McDaniel, Garvin, King, Bamberg, Calhoon, Ballentine, Murphy, Rutherford, Ligon, Gilliard, Forrest, Hyde
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2019-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-05-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Spires, Wheeler, Daning
2019-05-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox
2019-05-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Chellis, Kimmons, Elliott
2019-04-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Rivers, Henegan, S.Williams, Henderson-Myers
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bailey, Hardee, Bernstein, Thigpen, Caskey
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Brown, Pendarvis, Erickson, Bradley, R.Williams
2019-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile, Clary, Hewitt, Ott
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4843400(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback