SC H3083 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "south Carolina Resilience Revolving Fund Act"; To Establish The "south Carolina Resilience Revolving Fund" To Provide Low Interest Loans To Perform Flooded-home Buyouts And Floodplain Restoration, To Authorize The Bank To Undertake Certain Actions In Order To Properly Function, To Establish Certain Criteria For Loans And Eligible Fund Recipients, To Provide Certain Requirements For The Monies Within The Fund, And To Authorize The Department Of Natural Resources To Undertake Certain Actions To Effectively Operate The Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Resilience Revolving Fund Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-01-16HouseCommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-16HouseRecalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2018-12-18 Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0259 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback