SC H3080 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-10
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-10
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 56-1-180, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF A SPECIAL RESTRICTED DRIVER'S LICENSE TO CERTAIN MINORS BY THE DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE RESTRICTIONS CONTAINED IN THIS DRIVER'S LICENSE MAY BE MODIFIED OR WAIVED BY THE DEPARTMENT IF THE RESTRICTED LICENSEE PROVES THAT THE RESTRICTIONS INTERFERE WITH TRAVEL BETWEEN THE LICENSEE'S HOME AND RELIGIOUS SPONSORED EVENTS.
Title
Provide That The Restrictions Contained In This Driver's License May Be Modified Or Waived By The Department If The Restricted Licensee Proves That The Restrictions Interfere With Travel Between The Licensee's Home And Religious Sponsored Events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-03 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-10 | |
2009-03-03 | Introduced and read first time SJ-10 | |
2009-02-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-11 | |
2009-02-24 | Read second time HJ-28 | |
2009-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sellers | |
2009-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-02-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams | |
2009-02-18 | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works HJ-4 | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-43 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-43 | |
2008-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3285 (Similar To) 2009-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-23
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3080&session=118 |