SC H3073 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Delleney
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Delleney
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include Private School Students Within The Purview Of The Act If The Private School They Attend Does Not Offer The Same Activity, And To Define Necessary Terminology.
Title
Equal Access to Interscholastic Activities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Delleney |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0638 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4407 (Similar To) 2016-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duckworth
H4407 (Similar To) 2016-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duckworth
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3073&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/3073_20141211.htm |