SC H3064 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson, Bennett, Daning, Davis, Gilliard, Trantham, Mack, Pendarvis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson, Bennett, Daning, Davis, Gilliard, Trantham, Mack, Pendarvis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 16-3-930 So As To Define Necessary Terms, Create The Offense Of Luring A Child Into A Conveyance, Dwelling, Or Structure, And Provide A Penalty And Defenses To Prosecution.
Title
Luring a child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Jefferson, Bennett, Daning, Davis, Gilliard, Trantham, Mack, Pendarvis |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3064&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3064_20181218.htm |