SC H3064 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Board Of Pharmacy Shall Issue A Written Protocol In Compliance With Which Pharmacists, Without An Order Of A Practitioner, May Prescribe And Dispense Hormonal Contraceptive Patches And Self-administered Oral Hormonal Contraceptives; To Provide The Board Also Shall Adopt Certain Rules To Establish Standard Procedures For These Prescriptions And Dispensations; And To Provide That Laws Governing Insurance Coverage Of Contraceptive Drugs, Devices, Products, And Services Must Be Construed To Apply To Hormonal Contraceptive Patches And Self-administered Oral Hormonal Contraceptives Prescribed And Dispensed Pursuant To This Act.
Title
Hormonal contraceptives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 33 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 33 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Continued |
2018-03-22 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-47 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18 |
2018-02-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-1-18 |
2018-02-28 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-02-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-33 Nays-69 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rejected |
2018-02-27 | House | Amended |
2018-02-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-20-18 |
2018-02-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-15-18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-24-18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Jefferson |
2017-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-11-17 |
2017-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-17 |
2017-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17 |
2017-05-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-4-17 |
2017-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-27-17 |
2017-04-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-20-17 |
2017-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-6-17 |
2017-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17 |
2017-03-28 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |