SC H3063 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 20 To Chapter 3, Title 16 So As To Provide Penalties For A Person Convicted Of A Crime Contained In This Chapter With The Intent To Assault, Intimidate, Or Threaten A Person Because Of His Race, Religion, Color, Sex, Age, National Origin, Sexual Orientation, Or Homelessness; And To Amend Sections 16-11-510 And 16-11-520, Relating To Malicious Injury To Personal And Real Property, So As To Revise The Penalties For Malicious Injury To Real Property Offenses And To Provide Additional Penalties For Persons Who Maliciously Injure Personal Or Real Property Of Another Person With The Intent To Assault, Intimidate, Or Threaten That Person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate Crimes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2020-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
2020-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein
2019-05-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hosey, McDaniel, Ott
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy, Rose
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin
2019-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Robinson, Dillard, Mack, Anderson, McKnight, Bamberg, Brown, Moore, King, Pendarvis, Alexander, Hart, Jefferson, R.Williams, Rutherford, Henegan
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3069 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3068 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Henderson-Myers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1611510(n/a)See Bill Text
1611520(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback