SC H3060 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hutto
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hutto
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 7-13-25 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE STATE ELECTION COMMISSION SHALL ESTABLISH A PROCEDURE BY WHICH A QUALIFIED ELECTOR MAY CAST HIS BALLOT IN PERSON WITHOUT EXCUSE DURING AN EARLY VOTING PERIOD; TO ESTABLISH EARLY VOTING CENTERS TO ALLOW A REGISTERED COUNTY RESIDENT TO VOTE OUTSIDE THEIR PRECINCT; TO PROVIDE FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF EARLY VOTING LOCATIONS, AND REQUIRE THESE LOCATIONS AND TIMES TO BE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 30-4-80; AND TO AMEND SECTION 7-15-330, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE TIME OF APPLICATION FOR AN ABSENTEE BALLOT, SO AS TO DELETE THE AUTHORIZATION THAT AN APPLICATION MAY BE REQUESTED IN PERSON FOUR DAYS BEFORE AN ELECTION AND AUTHORIZING AN ABSENTEE APPLICATION MAY BE REQUESTED ONLY ON THE DAY BEFORE THE ELECTION.
Title
Delete The Authorization That An Application May Be Requested In Person Four Days Before An Election And Authorizing An Absentee Application May Be Requested Only On The Day Before The Election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-29 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hutto | |
2009-01-15 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-38 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-38 | |
2008-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0022 (Similar To) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
S0252 (Similar To) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
H3068 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-41
H3633 (Similar To) 2009-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-111
S0252 (Similar To) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott
H3068 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-41
H3633 (Similar To) 2009-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-111
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 4 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 15 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3060&session=118 |