SC H3056 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Conference committee appointed Hutto, Campsen, McElveen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Repealing Sections 50-19-210 Through 50-19-240 All Relating To The Prestwood Lake Wildlife Refuge Board; By Repealing Sections 50-19-1710 Through 50-19-1730 All Relating To The Catawba-wateree Fish And Game Commission; By Repealing Article 1 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 Relating To The Cherokee Fish And Game Club; By Repealing Article 3 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 Relating To The Darlington County Advisory Fish And Game Commission; By Repealing Article 17 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 Relating To The Duties Of The Lee County Legislative Delegation To Protect Fish And Game In Lee County; By Repealing Article 19 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 Relating To The Marion County Fish And Game Commission And The Establishment Of The Shelly Lake Fish Sanctuary In Marion County; By Repealing Article 21 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 Relating To Fish And Wildlife Projects In Marlboro County; By Repealing Article 23 Of Chapter 13, Title 51 Relating To The Enoree River Greenway Commission; By Redesignating Article 5 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 As "slade Lake Fishing"; And By Redesignating Article 29 Of Chapter 19, Title 50 As "fishing And Hunting In Lake Wateree".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting and fishing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateConference committee appointed Hutto, Campsen, McElveen
2021-05-13HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Forrest, Hixon, Atkinson
2021-05-13SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2021-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-2
2021-05-12HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2021-05-12HouseSenate amendment amended
2021-05-06SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2021-05-06SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2021-05-04SenateRead second time
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-02-02HouseRoll call Yeas-114 Nays-0
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2021-02-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50191710(n/a)See Bill Text
50191730(n/a)See Bill Text
5019210(n/a)See Bill Text
5019240(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback