SC H3055 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The “restorative Juvenile Practices And Approaches Act” By Creating The “juvenile Restorative Practices Study Committee” To Review Juvenile Justice Laws And Make Recommendations Concerning Related Reforms; And To Provide For The Composition, Duties, Staffing, And Dissolution Of The Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stop the School House to Jail House Pipeline Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2018-05-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-05-10SenateAmended
2018-05-09SenateRead second time
2018-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-20SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Shealy, Rice, Timmons
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-29HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-03-28HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-4
2017-03-28HouseRead second time
2017-03-28HouseAmended
2017-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mack, King, Henegan
2017-03-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-03-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2017-03-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2323117(n/a)See Bill Text
5963212(n/a)See Bill Text
5963235(n/a)See Bill Text
5963240(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3055&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20161215.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20170322.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20170323.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20170328.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20170503.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20180320.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20180321.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3055_20180510.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12954
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15267

Bill Comments

feedback