SC H3054 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urge Our Federal, State, And Local Governments, Along With Churches And Neighborhood Associations, To Accelerate Their Efforts To Assist The Homeless In Light Of The Nation's Economy And Adverse Weather Conditions.
Title
Assisting the homeless
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-22 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |