SC H3045 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 8-13-1375 So As To Require Independent Expenditure Committees To Provide Certain Disclosures And Disclaimers Regarding The Independent Expenditure Committee's Election Communications; And To Amend Section 8-13-1300, Relating To Definitions Applicable To South Carolina Campaign Practices, So As To Define The Terms "independent Expenditure Committee" And "election Communication".
Title
Independent Expenditure Committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-04-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, Funderburk |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3045&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3045_20181218.htm |