SC H3036 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-37-35 So As To Require Neonatal Testing For Certain Genetic Disorders And Diseases And For Other Purposes; And To Amend Section 44-37-30, Relating To Neonatal Testing Of Children, So As To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Establish A Newborn Screening Advisory Committee To Review The Desirability And Advisability Of Including Additional Metabolic, Genetic, And Congenital Disorders In Certain Neonatal Testing. - Ratified Title
Title
Neonatal testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 55 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 75 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-04-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2019-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Clary |
2019-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson |
2019-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, W.Cox |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway |
2019-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Huggins |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0225 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs