SC H3031 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Sunday Work Must Be Compensated At A Rate No Less Than The Minimum Wage Provided In Section 41-10-35.
Title
Minimum wage
Sponsors
Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Robert Brown [D] | Rep. Terry Alexander [D] | Rep. Patricia Henegan [D] |
Rep. Cezar McKnight [D] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0145 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H3431 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H3431 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 10 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 22 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |