SC H3027 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Act No. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Act No. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That, In Certain Situations, An Active Duty Member Of The Armed Forces Of The United States May Claim The Four Percent Assessment Ratio Regardless Of The Owner's Relocation And Regardless Of Any Rental Income, And To Provide That An Active Duty Member Of The Armed Forces Of The United States, In Certain Situations, May Claim The Four Percent Assessment Ratio On Two Residential Properties So Long As The Owner Attempts To Sell The First Residence Within Thirty Days Of Acquiring The Second Residence
Title
Property tax assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Act No. 133 | |
2014-03-18 | Effective date See Act For Effective Date | |
2014-03-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-03-11 | Ratified R 145 | |
2014-03-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-5-14 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter, Whipper, R.L.Brown |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2013-04-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Harrell |
2013-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith, Bernstein |
2013-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine |
2013-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-12-11 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3004 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
H3256 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Huggins
S0301 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H3256 (Similar To) 2014-01-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Huggins
S0301 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means