SC H3020 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 22 To Chapter 3, Title 16 So As To Provide Penalties For A Person Convicted Of A Crime Contained In This Chapter With The Intent To Assault, Intimidate, Or Threaten A Person Because Of His Race, Religion, Color, Sex, Age, National Origin, Or Sexual Orientation; And By Amending Sections 16-11-510 And 16-11-520, Both Relating To Malicious Injury To Personal And Real Property, So As To Revise The Penalties For Malicious Injury To Real Property Offenses And To Provide Additional Penalties For Persons Who Maliciously Injure Personal Or Real Property Of Another Person With The Intent To Assault, Intimidate, Or Threaten That Person.
Title
Hate crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0003 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0296 (Similar To) 2023-02-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3005 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3014 (Similar To) 2023-03-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0615 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0296 (Similar To) 2023-02-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3005 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3014 (Similar To) 2023-03-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0615 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3020&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3020_20221208.htm |