SC H3016 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Data Privacy Act" By Adding Article 3 To Chapter 13, Title 17 So As To Provide For A Citation, To Define Necessary Terms, To Provide That A Search Warrant Must Be Issued Before Certain Electronic Data May Be Seized By A Law Enforcement Agency, To Require The Law Enforcement Agency To Notify The Owner Of The Electronic Device, Data, Or Information Specified In The Search Warrant, To Prohibit A Law Enforcement Agency From Collecting Certain Information From A Third-party Without A Search Warrant, To Prohibit The Use Of Information Obtained In Violation Of The Provisions Of Article 3, And To Provide For Certain Exceptions; And To Designate Sections 17-13-10 Through 17-13-170 Of Chapter 13, Title 17 As Article 1, Entitled "general Provisions".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Data Privacy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171310(n/a)See Bill Text
1713170(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback