SC H3012 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 31, Title 23 So As To Enact The "second Amendment Protection Act", To Exclude From Federal Regulation Any Personal Firearm, Firearm Accessory, Or Ammunition Manufactured Commercially Or Privately And Owned In This State, To Provide As Long As Any Personal Firearm, Firearm Accessory, Or Ammunition Remains Within The Borders Of This State, It Is Not Subject To Any Federal Law, Regulation, Or Authority, To Prevent Any Federal Agent Or Contracted Employee, Any State Employee, Or Any Local Authority From Enforcing Any Federal Regulation Or Law Governing Any Personal Firearm, Firearm Accessory, Or Ammunition Manufactured Commercially Or Privately And Owned In This State, As Long As It Remains Within This State, To Prohibit The Arrest Or Detention Prior To A Trial For A Violation Of This Article, To Provide The Attorney General May Seek Injunctive Relief In Court To Enjoin Certain Federal Officials From Enforcing Federal Law Regarding A Firearm, A Firearm Accessory, Or Ammunition That Is Manufactured Commercially Or Privately And Owned In This State And Remains Within The Borders Of This State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second Amendment Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Trantham, D.C.Moss, Bryant, G.R.Smith, Martin, Davis, McCravy, Kimmons, Hixon, Gagnon, West, Atkinson, Sandifer, Whitmire, Yow, Lowe, Jordan, Fry, McGinnis, Erickson, Simrill, Wooten, Ballentine, Caskey
2021-02-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, W.Newton
2021-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2021-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCabe
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0369 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback