SC H3003 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enact The "human Trafficking Prevention Act", To Require A Business, Manufacturer, Wholesaler, Or Individual That Manufactures, Distributes, Or Sells A Product That Makes Content Accessible On The Internet To Install And Operate A Digital Blocking Capability That Renders Obscenity Inaccessible And To Set Minimum Requirements For The Blocking Capability; To Establish A Procedure For The Consumer To Deactivate The Digital Blocking Capability; To Allow A Reporting System To Unblock Content That Is Not Obscene, Such As Social Media Websites, And Authorize A Consumer To Seek Judicial Relief If The Filtered Content Is Not Unblocked Within A Reasonable Time; To Establish Criminal Penalties For A Business Or Individual That Violates This Article; To Authorize The Attorney General To Seek Injunctive Relief Against A Business, Manufacturer, Wholesaler Or Individual That Manufactures, Distributes, Or Sells Any Products In This State Without A Digital Blocking Capability, To Establish That A Consumer Or The Attorney General May File A Suit Against A Party That Is Unresponsive To A Report Of Obscene Material Breaching The Filter And To Prescribe Damages For Each Violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Prevention Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
2018-03-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2018-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2018-02-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2018-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Martin, Funderburk, Govan
2018-02-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback