RI S0093 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Facilitators accurate labeling for food produced or made in Rhode Island containing generally modified organisms. Requires the manufacturer to label items before putting them for sale in Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Modified Organisms To Be Labeled

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-04-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015)
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback