RI S0203 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows non-veterinarians to perform certain husbandry procedures that are commonly performed by owners of animal pets and livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
2015-06-25HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2015-06-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015)
2015-06-25HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2015-05-21HouseReferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2015-05-20SenateSenate passed Sub A
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/20/2015)
2015-05-13SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-05-08SenateScheduled for consideration (05/13/2015)
2015-03-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2015)
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback