RI S2868 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation (creates A 9 Member Task Force To Study The Prevalence And Impact Of Elder Abuse And Exploitation And Make Recommendations On Policies And Legislation, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By February 1, 2019, And Expire On June 30, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation (creates A 9 Member Task Force To Study The Prevalence And Impact Of Elder Abuse And Exploitation And Make Recommendations On Policies And Legislation, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By February 1, 2019, And Expire On June 30, 2019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - To study elderly abuse (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-17SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/17/2018)
2018-05-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback