RI S2796 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes preference in the awarding of state contracts for person or business whose highest paid executive receives compensation/salary equal to or less than (32) times that amount paid to its lowest paid full-time employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Purchases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05HouseReferred to House Finance
2014-06-05SenateSenate passed Sub A
2014-06-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014)
2014-06-03SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2014-05-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014)
2014-05-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-05-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2014)
2014-03-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback