RI S0037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and provide for online sports wagering through authorized hosting facilities in Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video-lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-02-13SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/13/2019)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-02-06SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback