RI H5799 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain persons entrusted with the care of animals to report any neglect or abuse reasonably believed to have been inflicted upon the animal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-04-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015)
2015-03-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback